+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 2
February 8, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 5, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor