+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ failed
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 29, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2005: House/ failed
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 46
- Absent: 5
February 23, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor