+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2010: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor