+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2012: Senate/ circled
February 14, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
January 31, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor