+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ amended/ placed on Consent
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
March 4, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 23, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 10, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor