+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (10)
March 5, 2021: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
March 5, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2021: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2021: Senate Comm - Held
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 26, 2021: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2021: House/ uncircled
February 19, 2021: House/ circled
February 19, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 8
February 17, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 13
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor