+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 10, 2016: Senate/ circled
March 10, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 5
March 10, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
February 29, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 9
February 12, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor