+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ circled
- House/ to Senate
- House/ amended
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 21, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
February 16, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
January 31, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor