+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 2
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 30
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
February 14, 2012: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor