+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Absent: 10
January 27, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor