+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 26, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor