+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ returned to Rules
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 5, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 5, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 2
January 27, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor