+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 22, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 21, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2006: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 15
February 28, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 3
January 26, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor