+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- House Failed
- House Amended
- House Read 3rd Time
- House Rules Comm to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House Under Suspension of the Rules
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm Report Favorable/Amended
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Received Fiscal Note from Fiscal
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Standing Committee
- House Received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Vote
February 27, 2003: House Failed
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor