+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ notification of bill tabled
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Lifted from Table
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House Comm - Tabled
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Vote
February 10, 2006: House Comm - Tabled
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor