+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 2
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 22, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 8, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor