+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor