+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment failed
- House/ floor amendment failed
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House/ 2nd reading
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
March 10, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 5
March 10, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 26, 2016: House/ floor amendment failed
February 26, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 3
February 19, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor