+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 3
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
House Floor Amendment 3
Passed
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
House Committee Amendment 2
Passed
+ − Votes (13)
March 13, 2019: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
March 13, 2019: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
March 13, 2019: Senate/ uncircled
March 12, 2019: Senate/ circled
March 12, 2019: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
March 12, 2019: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
March 5, 2019: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2019: House/ floor amendment # 3
February 19, 2019: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2019: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2019: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor