+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ failed
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2016: House/ failed
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor