+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment 2
Passed
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (7)
March 8, 2017: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
March 7, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
March 1, 2017: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
March 1, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
February 28, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 1
February 16, 2017: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor