+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 3
February 25, 2014: House/ substituted
February 13, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor