+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ failed
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ substituted
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ substituted by Rules
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (2)
February 26, 2009: House/ failed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 41
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor