+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ read 3 (Suspension)
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ read 2nd
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ circled
- House/ to Senate
- House/ amended
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House/ comm rpt fav/ substituted/ amended
- House/ read 2nd time returned to Rules Comm
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 31, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2004: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 5
March 3, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 27, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 24, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor