+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2022: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 18, 2022: Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2022: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 15, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 9, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor