+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
Senate Amendment # 2
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2011: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 64
- Absent: 11
February 25, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 22, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
February 14, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 8, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor