+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
February 8, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor