+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2014: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
February 26, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
February 10, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 6, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor