+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
- Enroll Draft
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 12, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
February 15, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 5
February 10, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 7, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 2
January 24, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor