+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 22, 2022: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 4
February 15, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 11, 2022: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
February 11, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor