+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 12, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2007: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 23, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 7
February 16, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 8, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 9
January 29, 2007: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor