+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Comm with amends
- House/ read 2nd time
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House/ to standing committee
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ substituted by Rules Committee
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
February 23, 2009: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor