+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment failed # 4
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 3
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House Comm - Held
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (12)
March 6, 2018: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2018: Senate/ uncircled
March 6, 2018: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2018: Senate/ motion to reconsider
March 6, 2018: Senate/ floor amendment failed # 4
March 6, 2018: Senate/ circled
March 1, 2018: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 32
- Absent: 4
February 27, 2018: House/ floor amendment # 3
February 16, 2018: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 16, 2018: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2018: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor