+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House Signed by Speaker/Enrolled
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from Senate
On January 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/signed by President to House
- Senate/pass 3rd
- Senate/read 3rd
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/pass 2nd
- Senate/read 2nd
- Senate/under suspension of the rules
- Senate/committee report favorable
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to Standing Committee
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/received from House
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Senate
- House Passed 3rd Reading
- House Read 3rd Time
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Comm Report Favorable/Amended
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Standing Committee
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
On January 15, 2003 in the House:
- House Received Fiscal Note from Fiscal
- House Received from General Counsel
On December 17, 2002 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 12, 2002 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (3)
January 31, 2003: Senate/pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
January 30, 2003: Senate/pass 2nd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
January 23, 2003: House Passed 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor