+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ circled
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 24, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 7, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On December 19, 2008 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 18, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 6, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2009: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 26, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
January 29, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor