+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ read 1st, 2nd, & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ pass 1st, 2nd, & 3rd (Suspension)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 1st, 2nd, 3rd (Under Suspension)
- House/ amended
- House/ substituted
- House/ uncircled
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2009: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
March 12, 2009: Senate/ pass 1st, 2nd, & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
March 3, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
February 27, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
February 3, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2009: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor