+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
- Senate Comm - Held
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 2017: Senate Comm - Held
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 7
February 17, 2017: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2017: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor