+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Vetoed
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substitute/ amended/ Consent Cal
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 29, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 26, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 25, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 22, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
February 16, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 10, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor