+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 6, 2018: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 28, 2018: Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2018: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 23, 2018: House/ uncircled
February 20, 2018: House/ circled
February 7, 2018: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2018: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2018: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor