+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 12, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Vote
February 1, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor