+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 29, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 6, 2014 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
March 6, 2014: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 5, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
March 5, 2014: Senate/ uncircled
March 5, 2014: Senate/ circled
February 28, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 12, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor