+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (54)
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- House/ substituted
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 6, 2012 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (9)
February 23, 2012: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 6
February 21, 2012: Senate/ floor amendment
February 21, 2012: Senate/ uncircled
February 21, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2012: Senate/ circled
February 16, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 3, 2012: House/ uncircled
February 3, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 2
January 23, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor