+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 4
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 3
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (4)
Senate Committee Amendment 4
Passed
House Committee Amendment 3
Passed
House Committee Amendment 2
Passed
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (10)
March 6, 2019: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 9
March 5, 2019: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2019: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 4
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2019: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2019: Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
February 12, 2019: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
February 12, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
February 12, 2019: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 3
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
February 12, 2019: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor