+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2020: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2020: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor