+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 21, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 28, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On December 26, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2008: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 15, 2008: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 1, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor