+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ floor amendment # 2
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ to Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 10, 2016: Senate/ floor amendment # 2
March 10, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 7
March 10, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
March 10, 2016: Senate/ circled
March 10, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
March 7, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 11
February 24, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor