+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- House/ filed
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ uncircled
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 14, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 12, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On December 4, 2006 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 16, 2006 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Vote
January 26, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor