+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 6, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 13, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 17, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (4)
February 4, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 3, 2011: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
January 28, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor