+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # verbal
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
March 4, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 5
March 3, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 6
March 2, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
March 2, 2016: Senate/ circled
March 2, 2016: Senate/ floor amendment # verbal
March 2, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 25, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 19, 2016: House/ circled
February 19, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
February 19, 2016: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 19, 2016: House/ uncircled
February 8, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor