+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ returned to Rules
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor